NH HB492 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor on 6/5/2015; Chapter 94; Effective Date 8/4/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor on 6/5/2015; Chapter 94; Effective Date 8/4/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to military and historic reenactments and commemorations.
Title
Relative to military and historic reenactments and commemorations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - House - Ought to Pass Amended (Y: 258 N: 54 NV: 60 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/5/2015; Chapter 94; Effective Date 8/4/2015 |
2015-05-13 | House | Enrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1779 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/7/2015); Senate Journal 14 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | === RESCHEDULED === Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/30/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | === CANCELLED SESSION === Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/23/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Hearing: 4/14/15, Room 100, State House, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 17 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0690h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 258-54; House Journal 26, PG. 1264-1266 |
2015-03-12 | House | Amendment #0690h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG. 1264-1265 |
2015-03-12 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep Hoell); House Journal 24, PG. 766 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0690h for Mar 11 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 395 |
2015-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-02-11 | House | Recommit (Rep Tholl): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG. 321 |
2015-02-11 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Hoell); House Journal 16, PG. 298 |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0168h for Feb 11 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar11, PG. 172 |
2015-02-04 | House | Executive Session: 2/4/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/3/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG. 226 |