NH HB492 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - Reconsider (Rep. Almy) Motion Failed Div 146-181
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the legalization and regulation of marijuana.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the legalization and regulation of marijuana.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-26 - House - ITL (Y: 192 N: 140 NV: 23 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - OTPA (Y: 169 N: 162 NV: 35 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2014-01-15 - House - Lay on Table (Y: 153 N: 185 NV: 28 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2014-01-15 - House - Reconsider (Y: 173 N: 165 NV: 28 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2014-01-15 - House - ITL (Y: 170 N: 168 NV: 28 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2014-01-15 - House - Lay on Table (Y: 113 N: 221 NV: 33 Abs: 28) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-26HouseReconsider (Rep. Almy) Motion Failed Div 146-181
2014-03-26HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 192-140
2014-03-19HouseMinority Committee Amendment #2014-1035h
2014-03-19HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment for Mar 25
2014-03-19HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 25 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar)
2014-03-17HouseExecutive Session: 3/18/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 (Time Change)
2014-03-10HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 3/18/2014 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2014-03-04HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 3/10/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2014-02-19HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202
2014-02-12House===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 2/14/2014 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202
2014-02-11HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 2/14/2014 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202
2014-02-05HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 2/10/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202
2014-01-28HouseExecutive Session: 2/04/2014 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202=RECESSED=
2014-01-28HouseFull Committee Work Session: 2/4/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202
2014-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 1/30/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202-204
2014-01-23House===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 1/30/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2014-01-23HouseFull Committee Work Session: 1/30/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2014-01-15HouseReferred to Ways and Means
2014-01-15HouseReconsider (Rep. Valillancourt) Motion Failed DV 116-215
2014-01-15HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #2334h Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 170-162
2014-01-15HouseAdopt Amendment #2334h Amendment Adopted DV 210-127
2014-01-15HouseLay on Table (Rep. Dumaine) Motion Failed Regular Calendar 153-185
2014-01-15HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #2334h (Rep. Valillancourt)
2014-01-15HouseInexpedient to Legislate Motion Failed DV 168-170
2014-01-15HouseReconsider (Rep. Sylvia) Motion Adopted DV 173-165
2014-01-15HouseInexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 170-168
2014-01-15HouseLay on the Table (Rep. Kappler) Motion Failed Regular Calendar 113-221
2013-11-25HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2334h
2013-11-25HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 8 (Vote 11-7; Regular Calendar)
2013-10-02HouseRetained Bill - Executive Session: 10/30/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2013-08-20HouseRetained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/19/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2013-02-19HouseRetained in Committee
2013-02-13HouseExecutive Session: 2/19/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2013-02-12HousePublic Hearing: 2/14/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301-303 ==ROOM CHANGE (Orig Legislative Office Building 204)==
2013-01-03HouseIntroduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG.197

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=443&sy=2014&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2014&q=1
Texthttp://www.gencourt.state.nh.us/legislation/2014/HB0492.html
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=24&sy=2014&lb=H&eb=HB0492&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2014&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=443
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=25&sy=2014&lb=H&eb=HB0492&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2014&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=443
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=26&sy=2014&lb=H&eb=HB0492&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2014&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=443
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=27&sy=2014&lb=H&eb=HB0492&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2014&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=443
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=28&sy=2014&lb=H&eb=HB0492&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2014&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=443
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=190&sy=2014&lb=H&eb=HB0492&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2014&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=443

Bill Comments

feedback