NH HB492 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-25 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2334h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-25 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2334h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the legalization and regulation of marijuana.
Title
Relative to the legalization and regulation of marijuana.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Vaillancourt [R] | Rep. Joel Winters [D] | Rep. Timothy Robertson [D] | Rep. Mark Warden [R] |
Rep. George Lambert [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-25 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2334h |
2013-11-25 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 8 (Vote 11-7; Regular Calendar) |
2013-10-02 | House | Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/30/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-08-20 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/19/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-02-19 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-02-12 | House | Public Hearing: 2/14/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301-303 ==ROOM CHANGE (Orig Legislative Office Building 204)== |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG.197 |