NH HB491 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2181s, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to questioning and detaining suspects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to questioning and detaining suspects.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2181s, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24
2019-04-05SenateHearing: 04/11/2019, Room 103, State House, 01:00 pm; the committee will meet at 1:00 p.m. or 30 minutes following the end of session; Senate Calendar 17A
2019-03-18SenateIntroduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9
2019-02-28HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0295h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 51
2019-02-28HouseAmendment # 2019-0295h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 51
2019-02-14HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-02-14HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0295h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 19-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 27
2019-01-29House==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 02/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-01-23House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 01/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 17

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback