NH HB490 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-18 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a commission to study the role of clinical diagnosis and the limitations of serological diagnostic tests in determining the presence or absence of Lyme and other tick-borne diseases and available treatment protocols, and appropriate methods for educating physicians and the public about the inconclusive nature of prevailing test methods and available treatment alternatives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to study the role of clinical diagnosis and the limitations of serological diagnostic tests in determining the presence or absence of Lyme and other tick-borne diseases and available treatment protocols, and appropriate methods for educating physicians and the public about the inconclusive nature of prevailing test methods and available treatment alternatives.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-18SenateCommittee Report: Referred to Interim Study; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
2019-04-18SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/18/2019; Senate Journal 13
2019-04-11SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 04/18/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18
2019-03-28Senate==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 04/02/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 16
2019-03-18SenateIntroduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 9
2019-02-27HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0062h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 16
2019-02-27HouseAmendment # 2019-0062h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 16
2019-02-12HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0062h (NT) for 02/27/2019 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 11
2019-01-30HouseExecutive Session: 02/07/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-30HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 17

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback