NH HB489 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 620
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 620
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to annulment of mental health records.
Title
Relative to annulment of mental health records.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Hannon [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Steven Beaudoin [R] | Rep. Eric Schleien [R] |
Rep. Edith Hogan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 620 |
2015-03-04 | House | Lay on Table (Rep Hannon): Motion Failed Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 620 |
2015-03-04 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Hoell); House Journal 22, PG. 559 |
2015-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 4 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar18, PG. 347 |
2015-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 2/17/2015 Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 2/10/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 12, PG. 226 |