NH HB489 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-23 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-23 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the New Hampshire medical malpractice joint underwriting association.
Title
Relative to the New Hampshire medical malpractice joint underwriting association.
Sponsors
Rep. John Hunt [R] | Rep. Edward Butler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 5/23/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 21 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 4/3/13, Room 100, State House, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 14 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Dept. & Admin |
2013-03-13 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0670h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.740-742 |
2013-03-13 | House | Amendment #0670h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.740-742 |
2013-03-06 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0670h; House Calendar 22, PG.550-551 |
2013-03-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0670h for Mar 13 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.501 |
2013-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-02-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/28/2013 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 2/19/2013 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.197 |