NH HB488 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 31; Eff: 07/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 31; Eff: 07/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring interpreters for the deaf and hard of hearing at the state house campus.
Title
Requiring interpreters for the deaf and hard of hearing at the state house campus.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 31; Eff: 07/14/2019 |
2019-05-07 | House | Enrolled 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 42 |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/02/2019); Senate Journal 16 |
2019-04-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1546e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/11/2019 House Journal 13 P. 126 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1546e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 04/18/2019); Senate Journal 14 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/11/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 17 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing: 04/03/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-02-28 | House | Referral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 46(f) 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 16 |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Finance 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 2 |
2019-02-28 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 2 |
2019-02-21 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/27/2019 (Vote 7-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 21 |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/13/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 3 P. 17 |