NH HB488 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - House Signed By Governor 05/27/2011; Effective 07/26/2011; Chapter 0100
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - House Signed By Governor 05/27/2011; Effective 07/26/2011; Chapter 0100
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to criminal records checks for employment with child day care agencies.
Title
Relative to criminal records checks for employment with child day care agencies.
Sponsors
Rep. Russell Day [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | House Signed By Governor 05/27/2011; Effective 07/26/2011; Chapter 0100 | |
2011-05-18 | House Enrolled; House Journal 44, PG.1564 | |
2011-05-18 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 18, Pg.364 | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 15, Pg.312 | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 15, Pg.307 | |
2011-04-25 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/4/11; Senate Calendar 22 | |
2011-03-15 | Senate Hearing: 3/24/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 9, Pg.103 | |
2011-03-02 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0378h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 25, PG.671 | |
2011-03-02 | House Amendment #0378h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 25, PG.671 | |
2011-02-18 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-0378h; House Calendar 18, PG.411 | |
2011-02-18 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0378h for Mar 2 (Vote 10-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.385 | |
2011-02-09 | House Public Hearing: 2/17/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 ==Executive Session to Follow== | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Children and Family Law; House Journal 11, PG. 188 |