NH HB487 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Lay HB487 on Table (Rep. Adjutant): Motion Adopted DV 195-172 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 P. 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Lay HB487 on Table (Rep. Adjutant): Motion Adopted DV 195-172 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 P. 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a New Hampshire farm-to-school reimbursement program.
Title
Establishing a New Hampshire farm-to-school reimbursement program.
Sponsors
Rep. Alexis Simpson [D] | Rep. Megan Murray [D] | Rep. Linda Massimilla [D] | Rep. Tony Caplan [D] |
Rep. Gary Merchant [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | House | Lay HB487 on Table (Rep. Adjutant): Motion Adopted DV 195-172 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 P. 49 |
2023-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0103h: Motion Failed DV 181-187 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 P. 49 |
2023-02-14 | House | Amendment # 2023-0103h: Amendment Adopted DV 183-181 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 P. 49 |
2023-02-07 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation HB487-FN (Vote ; Regular Calendar) |
2023-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 02/01/2023 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 18 |