NH HB487 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/25/2019; Senate Journal 14
Pending: Senate Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a registry for the deaf, hard of hearing, and deaf/blind in the department of health and human services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a registry for the deaf, hard of hearing, and deaf/blind in the department of health and human services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/25/2019; Senate Journal 14
2019-04-17SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 04/25/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19
2019-03-19SenateHearing: 04/03/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 15
2019-03-19SenateIntroduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-07HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0674h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 7
2019-03-07HouseAmendment # 2019-0674h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 7
2019-02-27HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0674h for 03/07/2019 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 5
2019-02-20HouseExecutive Session: 02/26/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-20HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 02/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-13HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 02/19/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-06HousePublic Hearing: 02/13/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 16

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback