NH HB486 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-11-09 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the protection of wetlands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the protection of wetlands.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-09HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar)
2017-09-28HouseExecutive Session: 10/18/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2017-09-13HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/20/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2017-08-31HouseRetained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 09/13/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 305
2017-02-28HouseRetained in Committee
2017-02-15House==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 02/22/2017 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 306
2017-02-08House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/21/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2017-02-01House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/15/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2017-01-25HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 104
2017-01-18HousePublic Hearing: 01/25/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 3 P. 15

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback