NH HB484 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB484
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to group dog licenses.
Title
Relative to group dog licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-10-11 | House | Executive Session: 11/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-09-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/02/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-03-05 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 03/05/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 3 P. 16 |
Same As/Similar To
HB484 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)