NH HB481 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Executive Session: 02/21/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Committee
Hearing: Feb 21 @ 11:00 am in Legislative Office Building 204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the legalization and regulation of cannabis and making appropriations therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the legalization and regulation of cannabis and making appropriations therefor.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HouseExecutive Session: 02/21/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-02-11House==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 02/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-02-07HouseFull Committee Work Session: 02/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-01-17House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-01-17House==TIME CHANGE== Full Committee Work Session: 02/06/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 204
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 02/05/2019 01:00 pm Reps Hall
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback