NH HB481 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 189-147 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 189-147 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the use of small capacity, light weight plastic bags by retailers.
Title
Relative to the use of small capacity, light weight plastic bags by retailers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 189-147 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 47 |
2017-02-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2017-02-15 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar) |
2017-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-01-24 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2017 10:40 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 3 P. 15 |