NH HB481 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed By Governor 07/10/2013; Effective 01/01/2014; Chapter 0212
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed By Governor 07/10/2013; Effective 01/01/2014; Chapter 0212
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Limiting the state's authority to seek reimbursement for public assistance.
Title
Limiting the state's authority to seek reimbursement for public assistance.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Hackel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | House | Signed By Governor 07/10/2013; Effective 01/01/2014; Chapter 0212 |
2013-06-14 | House | Enrolled, Recess of 6/5/13; House Journal 49, PG.1654 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-05 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1344s (Rep J.MacKay): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1585 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/30/13; Senate Calendar 22 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1344s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1344s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1344s, 5/2/13; Senate Calendar 18 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Hearing: 4/16/13, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 16 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health, Education & Human Services |
2013-03-20 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0778h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 27, PG.839 |
2013-03-20 | House | Amendment #0778h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 27, PG.839 |
2013-03-07 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0778h; House Calendar 23 PG.616-617 |
2013-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0778h for Mar 20 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 23 PG.578 |
2013-03-06 | House | Continued Executive Session: 3/7/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-02-26 | House | Continued Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 ==RECESSED== |
2013-02-20 | House | Continued Public Hearing: 2/26/2013 3:45 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 2/21/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 205 ==RECESSED== |
2013-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 2/19/2013 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 205 ==RECESSED== |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.197 |