NH HB480 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2019; Chapter 215; Eff: 07/12/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2019; Chapter 215; Eff: 07/12/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to sports betting.
Title
Relative to sports betting.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Rep. Brian Chirichiello [R] | Rep. Werner Horn [R] | Rep. Glen Aldrich [R] |
Rep. Jason Janvrin [R] | Rep. John Potucek [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Goley [D] | Rep. Timothy Soucy [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - OTPA (Y: 269 N: 82 NV: 9 Abs: 40) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2019; Chapter 215; Eff: 07/12/2019 |
2019-06-28 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1974s/2196s/2396s (Rep. Almy): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 13 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2019-2196s and 2019-2396s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Floor Amendment # 2019-2396s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-2196s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2196s, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1974s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Floor Amendment # 2019-1974s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | ==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 04/24/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 19A |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0974h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 269-82 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 41 |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendment # 2019-0974h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 41 |
2019-03-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-03-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0974h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 17-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 15 |
2019-03-08 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/13/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-02-14 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-29 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-23 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 3 P. 16 |