NH HB480 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to solitary confinement.
Title
Relative to solitary confinement.
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Robertson [D] | Rep. Lars Christiansen [R] | Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Rep. Gladys Johnsen [D] |
Rep. Dick Patten [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2013-11-25 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 8 (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 1 |
2013-10-02 | House | Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/30/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-08-20 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/11/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-05-14 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 5/28/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-02-28 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 2/28/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/7/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG.197 |