NH HB480 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-21 - House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 4 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-21 - House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 4 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a state renovation, repair, and painting (RRP) rule program relative to lead-safe practices.
Title
Establishing a state renovation, repair, and painting (RRP) rule program relative to lead-safe practices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-21 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 4 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar) | |
2011-09-27 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/11/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-08-10 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/23/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-08-10 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/16/2011 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-07-27 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/9/2011 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-07-27 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/2/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-06-22 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/28/2011 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-06-15 | House ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/30/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-06-01 | House ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/16/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-06-01 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/15/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-03-09 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.824 | |
2011-03-02 | House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-02-02 | House Public Hearing: 3/1/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-02-02 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 3/3/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 11, PG. 188 |