NH HB477 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB477
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-15 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-15 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to free speech on campuses in the university system and the community college system.
Title
Relative to free speech on campuses in the university system and the community college system.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Schleien [R] | Rep. Dan Hynes [R] | Rep. Robert Fisher [R] | Rep. Nick Zaricki [R] |
Rep. Brad Bailey [R] | Rep. Bart Fromuth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2017-11-15 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) |
2017-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 11/08/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-09-05 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/12/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-05-09 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 05/16/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-02-23 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/22/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-25 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/08/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 14 |
Same As/Similar To
HB477 (Carry Over) 2017-11-15 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate