NH HB477 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed By Governor 07/09/2013; Effective 9/7/2013; Chapter 0199
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed By Governor 07/09/2013; Effective 9/7/2013; Chapter 0199
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to differential pay for certain state employees providing direct care to inmates and patients.
Title
Relative to differential pay for certain state employees providing direct care to inmates and patients.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. Sylvia Gale [D] | Sen. Peggy Gilmour [D] | Rep. Alisson Turcotte [D] |
Rep. Jane Hunt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | House | Signed By Governor 07/09/2013; Effective 9/7/2013; Chapter 0199 |
2013-06-14 | House | Enrolled, Recess of 6/5/13; House Journal 49, PG.1654 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 6/6/13; Senate Calendar 23 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Without Objection, HB 477 is Special Ordered to the Next Session Day, 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/30/13; Senate Calendar 22 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Without Objection, HB 477 is Special Ordered to the Next Session Day, 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted; |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/23/13; Senate Calendar 21 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Without Objection, HB 477 is Special Ordered to the Next Session Day, 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted; |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Bragdon Moved to Remove HB 477 from the Consent Calendar |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/2/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 4/3/13, Room 100, State House, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 14 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Dept. & Admin |
2013-03-20 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Division Vote 190-149; House Journal 27, PG.882 |
2013-03-04 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 23 PG.594 |
2013-03-04 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 20 (Vote 11-7; Part II, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 23 PG.594 |
2013-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 2/26/2013 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 2/19/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 12, PG.197 |