NH HB476 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by the Governor on 7/6/2015; Chapter 195; Effective 9/4/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amending the definition of "qualifying medical condition" in the therapeutic cannabis law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the definition of "qualifying medical condition" in the therapeutic cannabis law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-07HouseSigned by the Governor on 7/6/2015; Chapter 195; Effective 9/4/2015
2015-06-24HouseEnrolled; House Journal 54, PG. 2102
2015-06-24SenateEnrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19
2015-06-03HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendments #1485s and #1500s (Rep Kotowski): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1813
2015-05-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 1485s and 1500s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 14
2015-05-14SenateSen. Sanborn Floor Amendment #2015-1500s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14
2015-05-14SenateCommittee Amendment 1485s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote
2015-05-07SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1485s, 5/14/15; Senate Calendar 21
2015-05-07SenateSpecial Order HB 476-FN to 5/14/15, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 13
2015-04-29SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1485s, 5/7/15; Senate Calendar 20
2015-04-15SenateHearing: 4/21/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:20 p.m.; Senate Calendar 18
2015-03-05SenateIntroduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 8
2015-03-04HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #0308h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 592
2015-03-04HouseAmendment #0308h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 592
2015-02-20HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0308h for Mar 4 (Vote 10-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar18, PG. 359
2015-02-18HouseExecutive Session: 2/17/2015 Legislative Office Building 205
2015-02-03HousePublic Hearing: 2/10/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206-208
2015-01-29House===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205
2015-01-28HousePublic Hearing: 2/5/2015 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 12, PG. 225

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback