NH HB474 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 169; Sec. 1/3/4/6-10/13/18 Eff: 07/10/2019 II. Rem. Eff: 09/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to principal offices of trust companies and banking and trusts insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to principal offices of trust companies and banking and trusts insurance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 169; Sec. 1/3/4/6-10/13/18 Eff: 07/10/2019 II. Rem. Eff: 09/08/2019
2019-06-12HouseEnrolled 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 47
2019-06-12SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-05-02SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15
2019-04-25SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2019; Senate Calendar 20
2019-04-11SenateHearing: 04/16/2019, Room 100, State House, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 18
2019-04-01SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-19HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0360h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 7
2019-03-19HouseAmendment # 2019-0360h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 7
2019-03-12HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0360h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 5
2019-02-28HouseExecutive Session: 03/08/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304
2019-02-25HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/26/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-29House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-24HousePublic Hearing: 02/05/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-10HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 15

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback