NH HB474 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-08 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-08 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to eligibility for in-state tuition rates at the university system of New Hampshire.
Title
Relative to eligibility for in-state tuition rates at the university system of New Hampshire.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-08 - Senate - Interim Study (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - OTPA (Y: 188 N: 155 NV: 21 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - OTPA (Y: 188 N: 155 NV: 21 Abs: 31) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-08 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N; Senate Journal 12 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 5/8/14; Senate Calendar 17 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Hearing: 4/22/14, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health, Education and Human Services |
2014-01-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #2219h Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 188-155 |
2014-01-22 | House | Adopt Amendment #2219h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2013-11-18 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2013-11-18 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2219h for Jan 8 (Vote 11-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 3 |
2013-09-03 | House | =RESCEDULED=Retained Bill - Executive Session: 11/7/2013 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-08-13 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/3/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-08-07 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/13/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-04-18 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 4/30/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-03-05 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Continued Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-02-21 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/28/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2013 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 207 ==RECESSED== |
2013-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 2/7/2013 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Education; House Journal 12, PG.197 |