NH HB473 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 15-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 15-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to retirement system status for members of the university system police force.
Title
Relative to retirement system status for members of the university system police force.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Sullivan [D] | Sen. Jeff Woodburn [D] | Rep. Frank Sapareto [R] | Rep. Herbert Richardson [R] |
Rep. Robert Walsh [D] | Sen. Andrew Hosmer [D] | Rep. Timothy Horrigan [D] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-31 | House | Interim Study Report: Not Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 15-0) |
2014-10-01 | House | Executive Session: 10/21/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2014-10-01 | House | Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/9/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2014-01-22 | House | Refer to Interim Study Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2013-11-25 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2013-11-25 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 8 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 3 |
2013-10-16 | House | Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/12/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-10-15 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/12/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-08-27 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/17/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-05-29 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Organizational Work Session: 6/4/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-03-05 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/4/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/26/2013 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-02-12 | House | Continued Public Hearing: 2/14/2013 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 ==RECESSED== |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG.197 |