NH HB473 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-25 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to retirement system status for members of the university system police force.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to retirement system status for members of the university system police force.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-11-25HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2013-11-25HouseMajority Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 8 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar)
2013-10-16HouseRetained Bill-Executive Session: 11/12/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2013-10-15HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/12/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
2013-08-27HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/17/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
2013-05-29HouseRetained Bill - Full Committee Organizational Work Session: 6/4/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
2013-03-05HouseRetained in Committee
2013-02-27HouseExecutive Session: 3/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2013-02-27HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 3/4/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
2013-02-13HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 2/26/2013 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2013-02-12HouseContinued Public Hearing: 2/14/2013 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2013-02-06HousePublic Hearing: 2/12/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 ==RECESSED==
2013-01-03HouseIntroduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG.197

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback