NH HB472 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to special number plates for certain veterans.
Title
Relative to special number plates for certain veterans.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra DeSimone [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. Lynne Ober [R] | Rep. Norman Major [R] |
Rep. Robert Harb [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | Senate | To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019; |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 04/02/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0696h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 43 |
2019-03-14 | House | Amendment # 2019-0696h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 43 |
2019-03-07 | House | Special Order to 03/14/2019 Without Objection House Journal 8 P. 60 |
2019-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0696h for 03/07/2019 (Vote 19-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 20 |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 02/26/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-02-13 | House | Public Hearing: 02/19/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Transportation House Journal 3 P. 15 |