NH HB472 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB472
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting qualifying patients to cultivate cannabis for their own therapeutic use.
Title
Permitting qualifying patients to cultivate cannabis for their own therapeutic use.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1 |
2017-09-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/03/2018; Senate Calendar 48 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/11/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 22 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Hearing: 04/11/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 18 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-09 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 133 |
2017-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 118-213 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 131 |
2017-03-01 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2017-03-01 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 14-7; Regular Calendar) |
2017-02-22 | House | Executive Session: 02/28/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-01-17 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2017 03:15 PM Reps Hall |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 14 |
Same As/Similar To
HB472 (Carry Over) 2017-09-22 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study