NH HB472 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Signed By Governor 07/24/2013; Effective 07/24/2013; Chapter 0253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Signed By Governor 07/24/2013; Effective 07/24/2013; Chapter 0253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to residential units in rooming houses.
Title
Relative to residential units in rooming houses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-26 - House - C OF C #2110C (Y: 235 N: 119 NV: 26 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-25 | House | Signed By Governor 07/24/2013; Effective 07/24/2013; Chapter 0253 |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 52, PG.1714 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | House | Conference Committee Report #2110c Adopted, Regular Calendar 235-119; House Journal 52, PG.1695-1697 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2110c; Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2013-2110c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed |
2013-06-12 | House | Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/18/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Bradley, Cataldo, Hosmer |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Moved Accede to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-05 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Butler, Schlachman, Muns, and Hammond; House Journal 49, PG.1565 |
2013-06-05 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment #1714s and Requests C of C (Rep Butler): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1565 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1714s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1714s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1714s, 5/23/13; Senate Calendar 21 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Hearing: 4/30/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 17 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 8 |
2013-03-13 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Division Vote 189-138; House Journal 26, PG.771-772 |
2013-03-06 | House | Special Order to Mar 13 Without Objection; House Journal 24, PG.703 |
2013-02-21 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 22, PG.514 |
2013-02-21 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 13 (Vote 10-7; Part I, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.514 |
2013-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2013 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.197 |