NH HB471 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-17 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-17 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the powers of the state board of education and the duties of school boards.
Title
Relative to the powers of the state board of education and the duties of school boards.
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Victoria Sullivan [R] | Rep. Carl Seidel [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Harris [R] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Laura Jones [R] | Rep. David Murotake [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] |
Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-17 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2015-11-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2433h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 18 |
2015-09-09 | House | Executive Session: 10/27/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-09-09 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/1/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-04-30 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/12/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-03-06 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing: 2/19/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Education; House Journal 12, PG. 225 |