NH HB470 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allowing state agencies to accept cryptocurrencies as payment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing state agencies to accept cryptocurrencies as payment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-13HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar)
2019-10-23HouseExecutive Session: 11/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306
2019-10-09HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/15/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-09-18HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/01/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306
2019-02-20HouseRetained in Committee
2019-02-13HouseExecutive Session: 02/19/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306
2019-02-06HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 306
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/29/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
2019-01-10HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 15

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback