NH HB468 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2017; Chapter 220; Eff. 9/8/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2017; Chapter 220; Eff. 9/8/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to licensure of mental health practitioners from other states.
Title
Relative to licensure of mental health practitioners from other states.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2017; Chapter 220; Eff. 9/8/2017 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-22 | House | Enrolled 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 23 |
2017-06-08 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1313s (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 5 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-1313s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-1313s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Pending Motion Committee Amendment #2017-1313s; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1313s, 04/20/2017; Senate Calendar 19 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Hearing: 03/22/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 24 |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/08/2017 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 13 |
2017-02-22 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-02-01 | House | Public Hearing: 02/14/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 14 |