NH HB466 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Signed by Governor Hassan 05/27/2016; Chapter 129; Eff. 7/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to farm tractor plates for certain specialized vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to farm tractor plates for certain specialized vehicles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-31HouseSigned by Governor Hassan 05/27/2016; Chapter 129; Eff. 7/26/2016
2016-05-23HouseEnrolled 05/19/2016
2016-05-20SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19
2016-05-05SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/05/2016; Senate Journal 16
2016-04-27SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/05/2016; Senate Calendar 17
2016-04-14SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/14/2016; Senate Journal 13
2016-04-07SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/14/2016; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14
2016-03-30SenateHearing: 04/05/2016, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 13
2016-02-22SenateIntroduced 02/18/2016 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 6
2016-01-06HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2471h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 37
2016-01-06HouseAmendment #2015-2471h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 37
2015-11-12HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2471h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 7
2015-09-30HouseExecutive Session: 10/13/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303
2015-09-14HouseRetained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/29/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303
2015-03-04HouseRetained in Committee
2015-02-11HouseExecutive Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303
2015-02-02HousePublic Hearing: 2/10/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Environment and Agriculture; House Journal 12, PG. 225

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback