NH HB466 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-29 - Signed by the Governor on 7/28/2014; Chapter 0260; Effective Date 7/28/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to determining qualifications of voters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to determining qualifications of voters.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-29HouseSigned by the Governor on 7/28/2014; Chapter 0260; Effective Date 7/28/2014.
2014-06-18HouseEnrolled (In recess of 6/4/14)
2014-06-04SenateEnrolled
2014-06-04HouseConference Committee Report #1941c, Adopted Voice Vote
2014-06-04SenateConference Committee Report 1941c; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15
2014-05-29SenateConference Committee Report #2014-1941c; Senate Amendment, Filed
2014-05-22HouseCommittee of Conference Meeting: 5/27/2014; 11:30 Amendment; Legislative Office Building 308
2014-05-20SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Boutin, Forrester, and Lasky
2014-05-15SenateSen. Boutin Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 13
2014-05-07HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps Gary Richardson, Perry, Till, Jasper
2014-05-07HouseNon-Concur with Senate Amendment and Requests C of C (Rep. Cote) Motion Adopted Voice Vote
2014-04-17SenateOught to Pass with Amendment #2014-1395s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9
2014-04-17SenateSen. Lasky Floor Amendment #2014-1395s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote
2014-04-17SenateSen. Lasky Moved Ought to Pass; Senate Journal 9
2014-04-17SenateRefer to Interim Study, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9
2014-04-17SenateSen. Lasky Moved to Remove HB 466 from the Consent Calendar; Senate Journal 9
2014-04-03SenateCommittee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 4/17/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14
2014-03-04SenateHearing: 3/12/14, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9
2014-02-19SenateIntroduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs
2014-01-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #2222h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote
2014-01-08HouseAmendment #2222h Adopted, Voice Vote
2013-11-22HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2222h for Jan 8 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 1
2013-10-16HouseRetained Bill-Executive Session: 11/6/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2013-09-24HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/3/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
2013-08-28HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/11/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307
2013-08-06HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/20/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308
2013-02-28HouseRetained in Committee
2013-02-20HouseExecutive Session: 2/28/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2013-01-30HousePublic Hearing: 2/7/2013 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2013-01-03HouseIntroduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 12, PG.196

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback