NH HB466 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-22 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2222h for Jan 8 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to determining qualifications of voters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to determining qualifications of voters.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-11-22HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2222h for Jan 8 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar)
2013-10-16HouseRetained Bill-Executive Session: 11/6/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2013-09-24HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/3/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
2013-08-28HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/11/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307
2013-08-06HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/20/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308
2013-02-28HouseRetained in Committee
2013-02-20HouseExecutive Session: 2/28/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2013-01-30HousePublic Hearing: 2/7/2013 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2013-01-03HouseIntroduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 12, PG.196

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback