NH HB466 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-18 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 2, Pg.68
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Eliminating the ballot law commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminating the ballot law commission.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-01-18 Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 2, Pg.68
2012-01-12 Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 1/18/12; Senate Calendar 3
2011-05-04 Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15, Pg.307
2011-04-27 Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 5/4/11; Senate Calendar 22
2011-04-20 Senate Hearing: 4/26/11, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 21
2011-03-30 Senate Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 12, Pg.243
2011-03-15 House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0834h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.797-798
2011-03-15 House Floor Amendment #2011-0834h (Rep Jasper) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.797-798
2011-03-10 House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 22, PG.552-553
2011-03-10 House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 15 (Vote 14-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.552-553
2011-03-02 House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2011-02-08 House Public Hearing: 2/15/2011 4:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308
2011-01-21 House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 11, PG. 187

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback