NH HB463 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-19 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 1/6/16; Senate Calendar 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-19 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 1/6/16; Senate Calendar 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to state agency communications.
Title
Relative to state agency communications.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Leishman [D] | Rep. Lynne Ober [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Marjorie Smith [D] |
Sen. Charles Morse [R] | Rep. Daniel Eaton [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 104 N: 244 NV: 42 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 1/6/16; Senate Calendar 49 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Sen. Carson moved to Rerefer to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/14/15; Senate Calendar 21 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Hearing: 4/22/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 17 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 585-587 |
2015-03-04 | House | Floor Amendment #2015-0521h (Rep Rosenwald): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 104-244; House Journal 22, PG. 585-587 |
2015-02-20 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0346h |
2015-02-20 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 4 (Vote 19-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar18, PG. 358 |
2015-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 2/12/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2015-02-04 | House | Division I Work Session: 2/10/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212 |
2015-02-02 | House | Continued Public Hearing: 2/4/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2015-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/2/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 ==RECESSED== |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Finance; House Journal 12, PG. 225 |