NH HB462 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 801-802
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 801-802
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing an increase in the fuel oil discharge cleanup fund fee.
Title
Repealing an increase in the fuel oil discharge cleanup fund fee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 801-802 |
2015-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 407 |
2015-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 2/18/2015 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-02-05 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-02-05 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/13/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 12, PG. 225 |