NH HB461 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB461

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Adding qualifying medical conditions to the therapeutic use of cannabis law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adding qualifying medical conditions to the therapeutic use of cannabis law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-16SenateVacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
2020-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 7
2020-01-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2754h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 129
2020-01-08HouseAmendment # 2019-2754h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 129
2019-11-13HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2754h (Vote 17-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 24
2019-10-22HouseExecutive Session: 11/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-10-03House==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 10/24/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-10-03HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/16/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-27HouseRetained in Committee
2019-02-20House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/26/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-20HouseDivision I Subcommittee Work Session: 02/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104
2019-01-31HouseDivision I Subcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212
2019-01-30House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/07/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/22/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-10HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 15

Same As/Similar To

HB461 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2754h (Vote 17-4; Regular Calendar)

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback