NH HB459 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 198-153 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 83
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting a transfer of funds within an adopted budget to a general ledger line item in such budget that contains an entry of zero dollars.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting a transfer of funds within an adopted budget to a general ledger line item in such budget that contains an entry of zero dollars.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-26 - House - ITL (Y: 198 N: 153 NV: 11 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - ITL (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 359 Abs: 29) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 198-153 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 83
2021-02-18HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0250h
2021-02-18HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 23
2021-01-27HouseExecutive Session: 02/08/2021 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96815613466
2021-01-21HousePublic Hearing: 02/01/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95927066667 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-10HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 2 P. 49

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback