NH HB459 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/30/2019; Chapter 306; I. Sec. 1-12 Eff: 01/01/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 07/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/30/2019; Chapter 306; I. Sec. 1-12 Eff: 01/01/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 07/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Defining hemp, relative to its growth and use in New Hampshire, establishing a committee to study the federal guidelines on growing hemp, and relative to costs of care for animals seized in animal cruelty cases and prohibiting the future ownership of animals in certain animal cruelty cases.
Title
Defining hemp, relative to its growth and use in New Hampshire, establishing a committee to study the federal guidelines on growing hemp, and relative to costs of care for animals seized in animal cruelty cases and prohibiting the future ownership of animals in certain animal cruelty cases.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Bixby [D] | Rep. Larry Gagne [R] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Rep. Jerry Knirk [D] |
Rep. John O'Connor [R] | Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/30/2019; Chapter 306; I. Sec. 1-12 Eff: 01/01/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 07/30/2019 |
2019-07-29 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 59 |
2019-07-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-07-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2661e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 56 |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2661e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2019-2614c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/27/2019; Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | House | Conference Committee Report 2614c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 32 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2019-2614c; 06/27/2019 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Conferee Change; Senator Watters Replaces Senator Feltes; Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-13 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 06/19/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Fuller Clark, Feltes, Bradley; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Sen. Fuller Clark Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Gourgue, Bixby, Pearl, Cushing 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 41 |
2019-06-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2019-2258s and 2019-1976s and Requests CofC (Rep. Gourgue): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 41 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Special Order to to the present time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2019-1976s and 2019-2258s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2019-2258s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1976s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1976s, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Hearing: 04/23/2019, Room 103, State House, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 19 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0790h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 19 |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendment # 2019-0790h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 19 |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0790h (NT) for 03/19/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 8 |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 03/05/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-02-20 | House | Public Hearing: 02/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 3 P. 15 |