NH HB459 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Died on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study medical services provided to residents of the New Hampshire veterans' home.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study medical services provided to residents of the New Hampshire veterans' home.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-11-18HouseDied on the Table
2015-03-12HouseLay on Table (Rep Theberge): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG. 1271
2015-03-12HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep Theberge); House Journal 24, PG. 766
2015-03-05HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 400
2015-02-24HouseExecutive Session: 3/2/2015 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2015-02-04HousePublic Hearing: 2/12/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG. 224

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback