NH HB459 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-18 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2394h for Jan 8 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-18 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2394h for Jan 8 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to poker games and charitable gaming.
Title
Relative to poker games and charitable gaming.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2394h for Jan 8 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2013-10-24 | House | Retained Bill - Executive Session: 11/13/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-09-06 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/19/2013 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-07-02 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/5/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-06-18 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/25/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2013-02-19 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Continued Executive Session: 2/19/2013 3:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 2/12/2013 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 ==RECESSED== |
2013-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/12/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 2/7/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 12, PG.196 |