NH HB459 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.708
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.708
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to placement of political advertising.
Title
Relative to placement of political advertising.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.708 | |
2011-03-02 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 15 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.529 | |
2011-02-23 | House Executive Session: 3/1/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2011-02-08 | House Public Hearing: 2/15/2011 3:40 PM Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and referred to Election Law; House Journal 11, PG. 187 |