NH HB458 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Lay on Table (Rep. Baldasaro): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 192-184 04/08/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to provision of menstrual products for students in need.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to provision of menstrual products for students in need.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - House - Table (Y: 192 N: 184 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - OTP (Y: 183 N: 193 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08HouseLay on Table (Rep. Baldasaro): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 192-184 04/08/2021
2021-04-08HouseOught to Pass: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 183-193 04/08/2021
2021-03-24HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2021-03-24HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 40
2021-02-23HousePublic Hearing: 02/23/2021 11:15 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94382337363 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-10HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 49

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback