NH HB458 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2019; Chapter 134; Eff: 06/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2019; Chapter 134; Eff: 06/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing certain inactive dedicated funds.
Title
Repealing certain inactive dedicated funds.
Sponsors
Rep. Norman Major [R] | Rep. Susan Almy [D] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2019; Chapter 134; Eff: 06/25/2019 |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 51 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/30/2019); Senate Journal 19 |
2019-05-16 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1908e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 101 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1908e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/15/2019); Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2019; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | ==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 04/24/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 19A |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0425h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 39 |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendment # 2019-0425h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 39 |
2019-03-14 | House | Special Order to 03/19/2019 Without Objection House Journal 9 P. 51 |
2019-03-07 | House | Special Order to 03/14/2019 Without Objection House Journal 8 P. 60 |
2019-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0425h for 03/07/2019 (Vote 17-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 22 |
2019-02-14 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2019 10:55 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-17 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 01/24/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-16 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/22/2019 04:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 3 P. 15 |