NH HB457 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2017; Chapter 103; Eff. 8/7/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2017; Chapter 103; Eff. 8/7/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to consumer credit division entities.
Title
Relative to consumer credit division entities.
Sponsors
Rep. John Hunt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-13 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2017; Chapter 103; Eff. 8/7/2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Enrolled 05/18/2017 House Journal 16 P. 9 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/18/2017); Senate Journal 18 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/11/2017; Senate Calendar 22 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Hearing: 04/11/2017, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 18 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0439h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 13 |
2017-03-08 | House | Amendment #2017-0439h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 13 |
2017-02-16 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0439h for 03/08/2017 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 7 |
2017-02-08 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/14/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-02-02 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/07/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2017-01-25 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 01/31/2017 01:45 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-01-17 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/25/2017 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 13 |