NH HB457 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Died on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Died on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a nurse practitioner position at the veterans' home and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Establishing a nurse practitioner position at the veterans' home and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Theberge [R] | Rep. Linda Massimilla [D] | Rep. Skip Rollins [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] |
Rep. Leon Rideout [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Frederick Rice [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-18 | House | Died on the Table |
2015-02-18 | House | Lay on Table: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG. 513 |
2015-02-13 | House | Committee report for 2/18/2015: Without Recommendation, House Calendar 13, PG. 246 |
2015-02-13 | House | Per House Rule 50, Withdrawn from Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG. 224 |