NH HB455 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-11 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 9, PG.542-543
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-11 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 9, PG.542-543
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing optional enhanced drivers' licenses and optional enhanced nondrivers' picture identification cards.
Title
Authorizing optional enhanced drivers' licenses and optional enhanced nondrivers' picture identification cards.
Sponsors
Rep. Lyle Bulis [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Frank Case [R] | Sen. John Gallus [R] |
Rep. Edmond Gionet [R] | Rep. Dennis Reed [R] | Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-11 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 9, PG.542-543 | |
2011-10-27 | House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 70, PG.2225 | |
2011-10-27 | House Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 4 (Vote 6-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 70, PG.2225 | |
2011-10-18 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2011-04-26 | House Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 5/3/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2011-03-02 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.826 | |
2011-02-23 | House Executive Session: 3/2/2011 Legislative Office Building 203 3:00 PM or immediately after House session | |
2011-02-08 | House Public Hearing: 2/22/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and referred to Transportation; House Journal 11, PG. 187 |