NH HB454 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-04 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.428
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-04 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.428
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a job creation credit against the business profits tax and the business enterprise tax for small businesses increasing employment in New Hampshire.
Title
Establishing a job creation credit against the business profits tax and the business enterprise tax for small businesses increasing employment in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Brunelle [D] | Rep. Anne Grassie [D] | Rep. Laurie Harding [D] | Rep. Timothy Horrigan [D] |
Sen. David Pierce [D] | Rep. Donna Schlachman [D] | Rep. Suzanne Smith [D] | Rep. Kathleen Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.428 | |
2011-11-02 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 4 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 70, PG.2211 | |
2011-10-20 | House Retained Bill - Rescheduled Executive Session 10/27/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-10-03 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/26/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 ==RECESSED== | |
2011-08-18 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/1/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-08-04 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/18/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-06-02 | House Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 6/7/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-03-09 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.826 | |
2011-02-23 | House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 2:00 PM)== | |
2011-02-23 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/9/2011 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-02-22 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/24/2011 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-02-16 | House ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 2/25/2011 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-02-10 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/15/2011 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-02-01 | House Public Hearing: 2/10/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and referred to Ways & Means; House Journal 11, PG. 187 |